The Harford Mutual Insurance Company v. iMedia Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Harford Mutual Insurance Company, Carriage Hill Associates and Carriage Hill Assc LP
Defendant: iMedia Brands, Inc. f/n/a Evine Live Inc. formerly known as Evine Live Inc. doing business as Evine doing business as evine.com, Evine Live Inc., Swagway, LLC and Hoverzon, LLC doing business as Swagtron
Case Number: 1:2020cv02713
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 Corrected MOTION to Vacate Default by Swagway, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hoverzon, LLC re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and contest jurisdiction Corrected Certificate of Service (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 CORRECTED NOTICE by Hoverzon, LLC Special Appearance to Contest Jurisdiction (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 CORRECTED NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L Arnsdorf on behalf of Swagway, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Swagway, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph)
November 5, 2020 Filing 27 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hoverzon, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/4/2020. (vals, Chambers)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and contest jurisdiction by Hoverzon, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Swagway, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/4/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate Default by Swagway, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Hoverzon, LLC served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020.(Konzelmann, Christopher)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 -VACATED, PER #24 - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Swagway, LLC (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/4/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Swagway, LLC (c/m 10/28/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariana K DeJan-Lenoir on behalf of iMedia Brands, Inc. (DeJan-Lenoir, Ariana)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Konzelmann in Support of Request for Entry of Clerk's Default, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Konzelmann, Christopher)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by iMedia Brands, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent iMedia Brands, Inc. for iMedia Brands, Inc..(Angotti, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Deficiency Notice for iMedia Brands, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/28/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by iMedia Brands, Inc..(Angotti, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that plaintiffs file and serve by mail on defendants a motion for entry of default by the Clerk and a motion for default judgment, or provide a report as to why such motions would be inappropriate, within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/20/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Anbinder, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. iMedia Brands, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020.(Konzelmann, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Konzelmann. Directing attorney Christopher Konzelmann to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Konzelmann (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8889136.) by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company(Anbinder, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Swagway, LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020.(Anbinder, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Hoverzon, LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020.(Anbinder, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hoverzon, LLC, Swagway, LLC, iMedia Brands, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Second Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Anbinder, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint, Writ of Summons to IMEDIA BRANDS (Anbinder, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Harford Mutual Insurance Company for The Harford Mutual Insurance Company.(Anbinder, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harford Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8870898.), filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Hoverzon, #2 Summons Summons to Imedia, #3 Summons Summons to Swagway)(Anbinder, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Harford Mutual Insurance Company v. iMedia Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harford Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D Anbinder
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carriage Hill Associates
Represented By: Robert D Anbinder
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carriage Hill Assc LP
Represented By: Robert D Anbinder
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iMedia Brands, Inc. f/n/a Evine Live Inc. formerly known as Evine Live Inc. doing business as Evine doing business as evine.com
Represented By: Matthew T Angotti
Represented By: Ariana K DeJan-Lenoir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evine Live Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T Angotti
Represented By: Ariana K DeJan-Lenoir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swagway, LLC
Represented By: Ralph L Arnsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoverzon, LLC doing business as Swagtron
Represented By: Ralph L Arnsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?