Armstrong v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Plaintiff: Alisha M. Armstrong
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02788
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #13 ). Mail sent to Alisha M. Armstrong (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2020 Filing 22 Consent NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Order (Balsamo, Anthony)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding informal discovery dispute procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/20/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/3/2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/20/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/20/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #12 ). Mail sent to Alisha M. Armstrong (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Jackson on behalf of Alisha M. Armstrong (Jackson, David)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/6/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Dunn, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(Dunn, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/29/2020.(c/m 9/29/2020)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 Removal Notification Letter to Plaintiff Armstrong (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/25/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Best Buy Stores, L.P. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 thru 9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Best Buy Stores, L.P. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Buy Stores, L.P., filed by Alisha M. Armstrong.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION By All Parties To Modify The Existing Scheduling Order by Alisha M. Armstrong, Best Buy Stores, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Best Buy Stores, L.P..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Civil Track Assignment and Scheduling Order (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Buy Stores, L.P., filed by Alisha M. Armstrong.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-19-004531. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637124890), filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha M. Armstrong
Represented By: David B Jackson
Represented By: Anthony Mario Balsamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher R Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?