Fuentes v. Super Bread II, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Fuentes Fuentes
Defendant: Super Cakes Corp doing business as Super Bread and Super Cakes Bakery and Super Bread II, Corp.
Petitioner: H&S Bakery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02826
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION to Quash: Plaintiffs' Opposition is due November 20, 2020 and H&S's Reply is due December 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/3/2020. (lmys, Chambers)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Consent Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opposition and Reply Briefs Concerning H&S Bakery, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by H&S Bakery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dvornicky, Jared)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION to Quash. Plaintiffs' Opposition is due October 30, 2020 and H&S's Reply is due November 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/13/2020. (lmys, Chambers)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order by H&S Bakery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(Dvornicky, Jared)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER regarding informal discovery dispute procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/2/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER regarding referral for all discovery and related scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/2/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER directing H&S Bakery, Inc. to file a reply by October 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/1/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for ECF 1, Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/30/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing fee: $ 47.00, receipt number 14637124967. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by H&S Bakery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Good Faith Certificate, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Filing Fee Paid)(slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/29/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes v. Super Bread II, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Cakes Corp doing business as Super Bread and Super Cakes Bakery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Bread II, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuentes Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: H&S Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: David William Kinkopf
Represented By: Jared Samuel Dvornicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?