Becker v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Plaintiff: Joann W Becker
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02837
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/24/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Parties Proposed Agenda for November 24, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER in all Tracks re: Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/10/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 12. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 40. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for October 28, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 64. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT BHR Short Form against Smith & Nephew Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8888100.), filed by Joann W Becker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann W Becker
Represented By: Alex C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?