Snowden et al v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Snowden and Judith Snowden
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, William M. Sivley, Robert M. Walton, Crystal Taylor, Raymond Chung and Hon. Robert Wilkie
Case Number: 1:2020cv02913
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Raymond Chung served on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; William M. Sivley served on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Robert Wilkie served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A Marquardt on behalf of U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs (Marquardt, Sarah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Raymond Chung, William M. Sivley, Crystal Taylor, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Walton, Robert Wilkie, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond Chung, William M. Sivley, Crystal Taylor, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Walton, Robert Wilkie ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637125115.), filed by Judith Snowden, Alfred Snowden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Cover Letter) (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden et al v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Snowden
Represented By: Christina Marie Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Snowden
Represented By: Christina Marie Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Sivley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?