Akselrod v. MarketPro Homebuyers LLC
Plaintiff: Gustave Akselrod
Defendant: MarketPro Homebuyers LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02966
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MarketPro Homebuyers LLC (Lucchesi, Thomas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MarketPro Homebuyers LLC.(Lucchesi, Thomas)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. MarketPro Homebuyers LLC's answer extended through and including 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/2/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MarketPro Homebuyers LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lucchesi, Thomas) Modified on 11/2/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Francis Lucchesi, III on behalf of MarketPro Homebuyers LLC (Lucchesi, Thomas)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Hurwitz on behalf of MarketPro Homebuyers LLC (Hurwitz, Eric)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustave Akselrod. MarketPro Homebuyers LLC served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020.(Paronich, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to MarketPro Homebuyers LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anthony I Paronich. Directing attorney Anthony I Paronich to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Paronich (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8910366.) by Gustave Akselrod(McGowan, John)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MarketPro Homebuyers filed by Gustave Akselrod. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8908432.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(McGowan, John) Modified on 10/14/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akselrod v. MarketPro Homebuyers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarketPro Homebuyers LLC
Represented By: Eric M Hurwitz
Represented By: Thomas Francis Lucchesi, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustave Akselrod
Represented By: Anthony I Paronich
Represented By: John Thomas McGowan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?