Romp et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Plaintiff: John Romp and Sharon Romp
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03062
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for October 28, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel re: transfer of MDL case (c/emailed 10/23/2020)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00279. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFIED ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER received from District of Maryland transferring case to District of Maryland, Catherine C. Blake, MDL No. 2775. Case file electronically transferred to District of Maryland. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Judicial Panel on 10/21/2020. (bas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 UNCERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER to MDL No. 2775 in the District of Maryland. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/21/2020. (lhc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #17 Joint Motion to Stay Proceeding and All Pending Deadlines is granted. Parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before 10/16/2020, or when Dft's MDL motion to transfer is ruled on, whichever comes first. Text entry order.(mr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding and All Pending Deadlines by Defendant Smith & Nephew Inc. (Clancy, Erin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Smith & Nephew Inc.(Clancy, Erin) Modified on 9/2/2020 to include jury demand(kjp).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 9/11/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 6/11/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiffs by 2/15/2021; and from Defendant by 3/15/2021. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiffs is 10/15/2020; as to Defendant is 11/1/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 7/11/2021. Parties have agreed upon Samuel Ardery as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/1/2020. (mrm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/31/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by atty Benjamin Ice. Dft appeared by atty Jordan Slusher. The #13 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Samuel Ardery appointed as Mediator. Atty Ice to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Slusher. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/21/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ice, Benjamin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R Minke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Minke, Lauren)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D Ice on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ice, Benjamin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew Inc re #6 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice to Plaintiff and Steuben County)(Slusher, Jordan)
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Smith & Nephew Inc; answer due 9/1/2020 per #7 . (lhc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Smith & Nephew Inc ; answer due by September 1, 2020. (Clancy, Erin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice in Steuben County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slusher, Jordan)
August 6, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin A Clancy on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Clancy, Erin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Slusher, Jordan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M Slusher on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Slusher, Jordan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4303421.) Cause No. 76D01-2007-CT-000253, filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff and State Court)(Slusher, Jordan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Smith & Nephew Inc, filed in Steuben Superior Court, 76D01-2007-CT-000253, by John Romp, Sharon Romp. (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romp et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Romp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Romp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?