Parker v. Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts
Plaintiff: Jamie Parker
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts
Case Number: 1:2020cv03150
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/22/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stolarz, John)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Providing Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/17/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing all parties to file a Magistrate Judge Consent Forms by no later than December 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/17/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/17/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/17/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #14 Consent to Magistrate Judge filed by Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/16/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kresslein, Charles)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/11/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/11/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Correspondence re: scheduling order matters (Kresslein, Charles)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A) by Jamie Parker (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stolarz, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/2/2021. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo to Counsel Scheduling Conference, #2 Standing Order on Discovery)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts.(Kresslein, Charles)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Kresslein, Charles)
November 6, 2020 Deficiency Notice as to Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/13/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts.(Kresslein, Charles)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/29/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE 2-4. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Parker. Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Jury Trial Demand by Jamie Parker(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts, filed by Jamie Parker. (Attachments: #1 Case Report Information)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-cv-20-001600. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8937983), filed by Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Writ of Summons, #4 Interrogatories, #5 Request for Production of Documents, #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #8 State Court Scheduling Order, #9 State Court Order for Mediation)(Kresslein, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Inc., d/b/a Advance Auto Parts
Represented By: Yodeski Y Acquie
Represented By: Charles Joseph Kresslein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Parker
Represented By: John B Stolarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?