Norris, et al. v. PNC Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Norris, III and Amanda Norris
Defendant: Safeguard Properties Management, LLC, PNC Bank, N.A., PNC, N.A. and Safeguard Properties
Case Number: 1:2020cv03315
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 1/7/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 1/7/21)
January 4, 2021 Filing 22 Correspondence re: amended cover sheet from Plaintiff and request to contact. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/4/2021. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (c/m again per request of Plaintiff 1/5/20) Modified on 1/5/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 Correspondence received from Amanda Norris re: Emergency Notice. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by PNC Bank, N.A., Safeguard Properties(Berkowitz, Matthew) (c/m to Plaintiffs per request 1/5/21) Modified on 1/5/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request to correct Defendant's name; denying as moot Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Extension to Serve Summons. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/18/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 12/21/20)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 Line by Plaintiffs re: Request to correct Defendant's name from PNC, N.A. to PNC Bank, N.A., et al. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to reissue summons and for Extension of Time to serve by Amanda Norris. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel , Certification of Filing of State Court Documents by Daniel Christopher Fanaselle on behalf of PNC, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fanaselle, Daniel)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/9/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 12/9/20 and c/m again per request of Plaintiff on 1/5/21) Modified on 1/5/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by PNC, N.A..(Tobin, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs by Amanda Norris, Joseph Norris, III (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Amanda Norris, Joseph Norris, III. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by PNC, N.A..(Tobin, Daniel)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting PNC, N.A.'s #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/20/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: PNC, N.A. answer due 12/7/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint by PNC, N.A..(Tobin, Daniel)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PNC, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc for PNC, N.A..(Tobin, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Safeguard Properties identifying Corporate Parent KJH Holdings Co. Inc., Other Affiliate Safeguard Holdings, LP, Other Affiliate Safeguard Holding, GP, LLC for Safeguard Properties.(Berkowitz, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Safeguard Properties.(Berkowitz, Matthew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/17/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/17/20)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Removal Notification Letter. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m to Plaintiffs 1/17/20)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Exhibits against PNC, N.A., Safeguard Properties, filed by Amanda Norris, Joseph Norris, III.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPIEY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland, case number C-03-CV-20-003761. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8964672), filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Tobin, Daniel)
November 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris, et al. v. PNC Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Tobin
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Tobin
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties
Represented By: Matthew D Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Norris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?