ComRent International, LLC v. Smidlein et al
Plaintiff: ComRent International, LLC
Defendant: David Smidlein, Distributed Power Solutions, LLC d/b/a Load Bank Solutions, David A. Smidlein and Distributed Power Solutions, LLC doing business as Load Bank Solutions
Case Number: 1:2020cv03356
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ComRent International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Erb, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 25 QC NOTICE: #24 Response in Support of Motion filed by ComRent International, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please refile document under the "Responses and Replies" category, select the "Reply to Response to Motion" event and link to the original motion. The response has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2021 Filing 24 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Support re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ComRent International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Erb, David) Modified on 1/7/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
January 5, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein.(Nardone, Marc)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of David Smidlein, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Dennis Carroll)(Nardone, Marc)
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ComRent International, LLC.(Erb, David)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #18 Correspondence re: Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/21/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Distributed Power Solutions, LLC (Nardone, Marc)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 Correspondence re: Expedited Discovery (Erb, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Sky Woodward on behalf of Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein (Woodward, Tara)
December 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ComRent International, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Erb, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Nardone, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Collura (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9004496.) by Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein(Nardone, Marc)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul Greco. Directing attorney Paul Greco to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Ralph Greco. Directing attorney Michael Ralph Greco to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ComRent International, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ComRent Holdings, Inc. for ComRent International, LLC.(Erb, David)
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Greco by ComRent International, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Erb, David)
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael R. Greco by ComRent International, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Erb, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by ComRent International, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by ComRent International, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Greco (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8978978.) by ComRent International, LLC(Erb, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael R. Greco (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8978969.) by ComRent International, LLC(Erb, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ComRent International, LLC. David A. Smidlein served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020.(Erb, David)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ComRent International, LLC. Distributed Power Solutions, LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020.(Erb, David)
November 19, 2020 Deficiency Notice to ComRent International, LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/27/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Distributed Power Solutions, LLC, David A. Smidlein. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Distributed Power Solutions, LLC d/b/a Load Bank Solutions, David Smidlein ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8969934.), filed by ComRent International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Summons Smidlein, #11 Summons Distributed Power Solutions)(Erb, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ComRent International, LLC v. Smidlein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smidlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distributed Power Solutions, LLC d/b/a Load Bank Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Smidlein
Represented By: Marc A Nardone
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distributed Power Solutions, LLC doing business as Load Bank Solutions
Represented By: Marc A Nardone
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ComRent International, LLC
Represented By: David W Erb
Represented By: Michael Ralph Greco
Represented By: Paul Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?