Fink v. Fink
Plaintiff: William Fink
Defendant: Craigory Fink
Case Number: 1:2020cv03380
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Case Closed. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/28/2020. (c/m 12/28/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Craigory Fink (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Craigory Fink (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Craigory Fink. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Craigory Fink (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/19/2020. (c/m 11/20/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Removal Notification Letter Sent to William Fink. (c/m 11/20/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craigory Fink(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order of Court and Warrant for Delivery of Premises. Signed by Circuit Court Judge for Baltimore County on 10/21/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number c-03-cv-20-0591., filed by Craigory Fink. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craigory Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?