Moyer et al v. Home Point Financial Corporation
Plaintiff: Sandra Moyer, Terry Patterson, Jr., Richard Martin and Yvonne Mathews
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corporation and Maverick Funding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03449
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Holly Bunting. Directing attorney Holly Bunting to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Debra Bogo-Ernst by Home Point Financial Corporation. The fee has already been paid.(Monks, Katherine)
January 20, 2021 Filing 18 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Holly Spencer Bunting by Home Point Financial Corporation. The fee has already been paid.(Monks, Katherine)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas V Panoff. Directing attorney Thomas V Panoff to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Home Point Financial Corporation needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Home Point Financial Corporation needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Home Point Financial Corporation.(Monks, Katherine)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas V. Panoff (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9063701.) by Home Point Financial Corporation(Monks, Katherine)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Debra Bogo-Ernst (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9063685.) by Home Point Financial Corporation(Monks, Katherine)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Holly Spencer Bunting (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9063667.) by Home Point Financial Corporation(Monks, Katherine)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed). Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/4/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Home Point Financial Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order)(Monks, Katherine)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendant's Statement in Response to the Court's Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Home Point Financial Corporation.(Monks, Katherine)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/30/2020. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Adverse Party by Home Point Financial Corporation (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Home Point Financial Corporation (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Home Point Financial Corporation, filed by Sandra Moyer, Richard Martin, Terry Patterson, Jr, Yvonne Mathews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 19, #2 Exhibit 20 thru 42, #3 Case Information Report)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3 thru 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Home Point Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Home Point Capital Inc. for Home Point Financial Corporation.(Monks, Katherine)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-20-003899. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8983561), filed by Home Point Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monks, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer et al v. Home Point Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Monks
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Holly Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Funding Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Monks
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Holly Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Moyer
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Patterson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Martin
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Mathews
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?