Jennings v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steven Jennings
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00376
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 4/9/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/6/2021. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Joint Initial Report by Steven Jennings(Siskind, Keith)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/5/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Austin, Heather)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Healthcare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent UHIC Holdings, Inc. for United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Austin, Heather)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT re: #1 Complaint filed by Steven Jennings. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company filed by Steven Jennings. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14637126874) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Letter) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Janene Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jennings
Represented By: Keith R Siskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?