Liverpool v. Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Liverpool
Defendant: John Doe Security Guard 1, Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Acquisition Company, John Doe Supervisor, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, CBAC Borrower, LLC and John Doe Security Guard 2
Case Number: 1:2021cv00510
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Stay Discovery and/or for Discovery Order and Schedule Clarification filed by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore.(Hebb, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore.(Hebb, Robert)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pltf Req for Summons, #2 Exhibit Pltf Motion to Defer, #3 Exhibit Affidavit CAC, #4 Exhibit Affidavit CBMC, #5 Exhibit Affidavit CEI, #6 Exhibit Affidavit CGP, #7 Exhibit Affidvit CLC, #8 Exhibit Affidavit CBAC, #9 Exhibit Affidavit JD1, #10 Exhibit Affidavit JD2, #11 Exhibit Affidavit JD Supervisor, #12 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 MOTION to Stay Discovery and/or for Discovery Order and Schedule Clarification filed by Dominique Liverpool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Opposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Carpio, Abraham)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CBAC Borrower, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate CBAC Gaming, LLC, Other Affiliate CR Baltimore Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate CVPR Gaming Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate PRT Two, LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CBAC Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Baltimore Investment Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Rock Gaming Mothership, LLC for CBAC Borrower, LLC.(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Entertainment, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Caesars Entertainment, Inc..(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Growth Partners, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Holdings, Inc. for Caesars Growth Partners, LLC.(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Acquisition Company identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment, Inc. for Caesars Acquisition Company.(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate CEOC LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Resort Collection LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Baltimore Acquisition Company, LLC for Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC.(Hebb, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate CAESARS ENTERPRISE SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate CEOC LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Resort Collection LLC, Other Affiliate Caesars Holdings, Inc. for Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore.(Hebb, Robert)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hebb, Robert)
March 10, 2021 Deficiency Notice as to CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC and Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/17/2021 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore.(Hebb, Robert)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Discovery and/or for Discovery Order and Schedule Clarification by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hebb, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company,Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hebb, Robert) Modified on 3/5/2021 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dominique Liverpool (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Remand)(Carpio, Abraham)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Medoff on behalf of Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC (Medoff, Richard)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/26/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore, John Doe Security Guard 1, John Doe Security Guard 2, John Doe Supervisor.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against CBAC Borrower, LLC, Caesars Acquisition Company, Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC, Caesars Entertainment, Inc., Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore, John Doe Security Guard 1, John Doe Security Guard 2, John Doe Supervisor, filed by Dominique Liverpool.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC /Notice to Adverse Party (Hebb, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20003829. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9132908), filed by Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Charles McCreedy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - March 16, 2020 from R. Hebb to A.F. Carpio, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3.1 - Writs of Summons for Defendants, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3.2 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3.3 - Defendant Caesars Baltimore Management Company Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3.4 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hebb, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liverpool v. Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Security Guard 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Growth Partners, LLC
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars License Company, LLC/d/ba Horseshoe Casino Baltimore
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Acquisition Company
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Baltimore Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Abraham Fernando Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBAC Borrower, LLC
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Security Guard 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Liverpool
Represented By: Abraham Fernando Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?