nTech Solutions, Inc. v. Meta Dimensions, Inc et al
Plaintiff: nTech Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Meta Dimensions, Inc, Amit Prakash, Talati and Patel, PLLC and Shilpi Goel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00673
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Amit Prakash (c/m 04/22/2021 ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Meta Dimensions, Inc (c/m 04/22/2021 ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Shilpi Goel (c/m 04/22/2021 ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shilpi Goel, Meta Dimensions, Inc, Amit Prakash (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by nTech Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery, #2 Affidavit of Michael J. Lentz, #3 Exhibit VA SCC Information, #4 Affidavit of Surajit Sengupta, #5 Exhibit Sample e-mail correspondence, #6 Exhibit Redacted Invoice, #7 Exhibit Redacted unbilled invoice)(Lentz, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by nTech Solutions, Inc.. Meta Dimensions, Inc served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Proof of Delivery)(Lentz, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by nTech Solutions, Inc.. Shilpi Goel served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Proof of Delivery)(Lentz, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by nTech Solutions, Inc.. Amit Prakash served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Proof of delivery)(Lentz, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 QC NOTICE: 5 Affidavit of Service filed by nTech Solutions, Inc., 6 Affidavit of Service filed by nTech Solutions, Inc., 7 Affidavit of Service, filed by nTech Solutions, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by nTech Solutions, Inc. (Lentz, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Shilpi Goel, Meta Dimensions, Inc, Amit Prakash, Talati and Patel, PLLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by nTech Solutions, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant Amit Prakash, #2 Summons to Defendant Meta Dimensions, Inc., #3 Summons to Defendant Shilpi Goel, #4 Summons to Defendant Talati & Patel, PLLC)(Lentz, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9166263.), filed by nTech Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit Escrow Agreement)(Lentz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: nTech Solutions, Inc. v. Meta Dimensions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: nTech Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Dimensions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Prakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talati and Patel, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilpi Goel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?