Andrews et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Faye Andrews and William Wayne Andrews
Defendant: JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC, Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc., Michael Taylor and Smith & Nephew Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00756
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 Correspondence to Parties re: Transfer Notification Letter. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00103. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-59) transferring case to the District of Maryland for inclusion in MDL 2775 in re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation and assigned to the Honorable Catherine C Blake (Signed by Clerk of the Panel) (bjc, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof /Memorandum in Opposition filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Johnson, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before April 5, 2021. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on April 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/16/21. (ljw, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David W O'Quinn on behalf of JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC, Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc., Michael Taylor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8298146. (O'Quinn, David)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smith & Nephew PLC for Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Johnson, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Sandra Faye Andrews, William Wayne Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petroff, Kip)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 and Brief in Support Thereof by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sandra Faye Andrews, William Wayne Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petroff, Kip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
March 9, 2021 The following attorneys were contacted on 3/9/2021 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiffs' attorney Caio Formenti and Kristopher Bonham. Defendants' attorney David W O'Quinn. (bjc, )
March 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
March 9, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
March 8, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sandra Faye Andrews, William Wayne Andrews, JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC, Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc., Michael Taylor. (bjc, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 PETITION by JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC, Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc., Michael Taylor.(bjc, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew, Inc. from 60th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, TX, case number B-207021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8283990), filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pltfs Petition, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Orthopedic Appliances, LLC
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Play Orthopaedics Sales, Inc.
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Taylor
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Kealy C Sehic
Represented By: Brian P Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Faye Andrews
Represented By: Kip Allan Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wayne Andrews
Represented By: Kip Allan Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?