Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Norris, et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: Lollis Powell, Michael Norris, Nancy Shepke and Danny Norris
Case Number: 1:2021cv00835
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Nancy Shepke waiver sent on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Michael Norris waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Lollis Powell waiver sent on 4/21/2021, answer due 6/21/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #6 and #7 Waivers of Service Executed filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, were filed incorrectly. **Dates on waiver are not the same as dates entered on the CM/ECF system. Please re-file and make any corrections as needed. They have been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Check Received on 4/26/21 from Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Check Number: 23381015. Amount: $28,502.54. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Michael Norris waiver sent on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen) Modified on 4/27/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Lollis Powell waiver sent on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen) Modified on 4/27/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Danny Norris served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021.(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Deposit Funds as set forth. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/13/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/em finance 4/14/21)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Danny Norris, Michael Norris, Lollis Powell, Nancy Shepke.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Interpleader) against DANNY NORRIS, MICHAEL NORRIS, LOLLIS POWELL, NANCY SHEPKE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9196662.), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, #3 Exhibit A -- Policy, #4 Exhibit B -- Beneficiary Election, #5 Exhibit C -- Death Certificate, #6 Exhibit D -- Criminal Docket, #7 Summons Danny Norris, #8 Summons Lollis Powell, #9 Summons Michael Norris, #10 Summons Nancy Shepke)(Mullen, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Norris, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lollis Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Shepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?