Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund et al v. First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the International Training Fund and Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund
Defendant: First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01119
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund. First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC served on 6/5/2021, answer due 6/28/2021.(Szewczyk, Jacob)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/11/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund or counsel for Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/25/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kelser on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelser, Andrew)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund (Szewczyk, Jacob)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9264626.), filed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Service)(Szewczyk, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund et al v. First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local Union No. 602
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Training Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?