Mango v. Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Mango
Defendant: Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01290
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge (Sanders, Craig)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/22/2021.. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/23/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/23/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2021 Deficiency Notice as to Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/16/2021 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC.(Gaumont, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory P. Mango. Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021.(Sanders, Craig)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Correspondence re: Copyright Letter. (c/m 5/26/20201 bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Jury Trial Demand by Gregory P. Mango(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9294927.), filed by Gregory P. Mango. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mango v. Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Mango
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Jewish Life, LLC
Represented By: Robert A Gaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?