Samnang v. Bouchard Ventures, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie Nadeth Samnang
Defendant: Ventures, LLC Bouchard and Buchard Ventures, LLC doing business as Aspen Beauty Academy of Laurel
Case Number: 1:2021cv01398
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buchard Ventures, LLC, filed by Jamie Nadeth Samnang. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline copy Amended Complaint)(NDE FAH, JOSEPH MITTERAND)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/12/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jamie Nadeth Samnang (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NDE FAH, JOSEPH MITTERAND)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Buchard Ventures, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Viola, Gregg)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Nadeth Samnang. Buchard Ventures, LLC served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Buchard Ventures, LLC or counsel for Buchard Ventures, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/1/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Moeller, Jr on behalf of Buchard Ventures, LLC (Moeller, Joseph)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Edward Viola on behalf of Buchard Ventures, LLC (Viola, Gregg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 8 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Jamie Nadeth Samnang must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/9/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Jamie Nadeth Samnang or counsel for Jamie Nadeth Samnang are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/23/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR- Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/9/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR- NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Jamie Nadeth Samnang or counsel for Jamie Nadeth Samnang are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/23/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Buchard Ventures, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Writ of of Summons for Defendant Bouchard (NDE FAH, JOSEPH MITTERAND)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Discrimination and Retaliation against Buchard Ventures, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9313184.), filed by Jamie Nadeth Samnang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 To Initial Complaint)(NDE FAH, JOSEPH MITTERAND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samnang v. Bouchard Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventures, LLC Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchard Ventures, LLC doing business as Aspen Beauty Academy of Laurel
Represented By: Gregg Edward Viola
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moeller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Nadeth Samnang
Represented By: JOSEPH MITTERAND NDE FAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?