Ta v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: NGAN TA
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS, TRACY RENAUD and ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Case Number: 1:2021cv01457
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ngan Ta re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case and to Extend Time Consent to transfer (Hacking, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case and to Extend Time by Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ngan Ta. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/23/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security or counsel for Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (LeDuc, Vickie)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/15/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - incorrect event used) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/15/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/15/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Ngan Ta or counsel for Ngan Ta are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/29/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9323829.), filed by NGAN TA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ta v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN MARIE JORDAN-STARKS
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NGAN TA
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?