Burleson v. Lincoln National Life Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: Raymond Burleson
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Ins. Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01549
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Ins. Co..(Wilson, Patrick)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation (LNC) for Lincoln National Life Ins. Co..(Wilson, Patrick)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Lincoln National Life Ins. Co. answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Patrick)
June 24, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/23/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Raymond Burleson or counsel for Raymond Burleson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/7/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lincoln National Life Ins. Co.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Ins. Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14637108621.), filed by Raymond Burleson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burleson v. Lincoln National Life Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Burleson
Represented By: Keith R Siskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Ins. Co.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?