Smith v. Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Defendant: Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston
Case Number: 1:2021cv01635
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #11 Status Report filed by Jennifer Smith. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/30/2021. (vals, Chambers)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint by Jennifer Smith(Siskind, Keith)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/31/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/18/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston.(Wilson, Patrick)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston.(Wilson, Patrick)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston answer due 8/17/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/29/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Patrick)
July 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/2/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Jennifer Smith or counsel for Jennifer Smith are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14637128750.), filed by Jennifer Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Assurance Co. of Boston
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Keith R Siskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?