Taylor v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Marcus Roosevelt Taylor
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01786
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING USA file a response no later than 60 days from the date of this Order re #1 Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/31/2021. (c/m:def and c/ad hoc:AUSA 9/1/2021) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Roosevelt Taylor (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Motion for Return of Property by Marcus Roosevelt Taylor (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner 28 days to pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/3/2021. (c/m:enclosure) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Motion for Return of Property filed by Marcus Roosevelt Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Roosevelt Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?