Sulaiman et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: MOHANAD A. SULAIMAN, DIMA ALI AHMAD and FARES M. SULEIMAN
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD and KATHLEEN BAUSMAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv01913
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A Marquardt on behalf of KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Marquardt, Sarah)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FARES M. SULEIMAN, DIMA ALI AHMAD, MOHANAD A. SULAIMAN. KATHLEEN BAUSMAN served on 8/19/2021, answer due 10/18/2021; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Status Conference held on 9/1/2021 before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: Linda Marshall - via Zoom) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 List of Visa Cases) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 List of Visa Cases) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9408133.), filed by FARES M. SULEIMAN, DIMA ALI AHMAD, MOHANAD A. SULAIMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulaiman et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHANAD A. SULAIMAN
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMA ALI AHMAD
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARES M. SULEIMAN
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN BAUSMAN
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?