Tapestry, Inc. v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tapestry, Inc.
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01941
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Table of Contents, #2 Attachment Table of Authorities, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Attachment Request for Hearing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Bryant)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal /Statement Concerning Removal filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company.(Green, Bryant)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tapestry, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Factory Mutual Insurance Company for Tapestry, Inc..(Freid-Studlo, Laura)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Tapestry, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and everyone designated on your disclosure statement that may have financial interest in the outcome of the case, including the insurance company, needs to be added as a corporate parent or other affiliate when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving #7 Joint Stipulation and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/9/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tapestry, Inc. (Freid-Studlo, Laura) Modified on 8/10/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Freid-Studlo on behalf of Tapestry, Inc. (Freid-Studlo, Laura)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION [Joint] and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roswell, Craig)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/4/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Removal of Action by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Factory Mutual Insurance Company filed by Tapestry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Pages 3, 244-284 are blank, #2 Exhibit 2, Page 3 is blank, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5 (a)(Green, Bryant)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Factory Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Factory Mutual Insurance Company for Factory Mutual Insurance Company.(Green, Bryant)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-21-002002. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9411672), filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Green, Bryant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapestry, Inc. v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tapestry, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Represented By: Laura Ann Freid-Studlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryant Steven Green
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?