Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Norris et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary J Norris, Alicia Alcarese and Kim Robertson
Case Number: 1:2021cv02025
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Check Received on 9/28/21 from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Check Number: 003839870. Amount: $76,594.29. Receipt # 14637129874. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting conference call re schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/27/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alicia Alcarese, Kim Robertson.(West, James)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Deposit Funds into Registry of Court. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/25/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)(c/nef finance 8/25/21)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Mary J Norris waiver sent on 8/19/2021, answer due 10/18/2021.(Aguirre, Samir)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Alicia Alcarese waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; Kim Robertson waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021.(Aguirre, Samir)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gail Lynn Westover on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Westover, Gail)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alicia Alcarese, Mary J Norris, Kim Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(Aguirre, Samir)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Aguirre, Samir)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9428540.), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aguirre, Samir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Samir Alfonso Aguirre
Represented By: Gail Lynn Westover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Alcarese
Represented By: James H West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Robertson
Represented By: James H West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?