Williams v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: T. Kimberly Williams
Defendant: Helena Dupont Wright and Lucy Dunne
Case Number: 1:2021cv02076
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lucy Dunne, Helena Dupont Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Ishak, April)
September 29, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Lynn Meter on behalf of T. Kimberly Williams (Meter, Susan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Hopkins on behalf of T. Kimberly Williams (Hopkins, Elizabeth)
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by T. Kimberly Williams.(Scott, Kirsten)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Teresa Renaker. Directing attorney Teresa Renaker to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/10/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Teresa Renaker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9484529.) by T. Kimberly Williams(Kotz, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/9/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 , #16 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Helena duPont Wright, Lucy Dunne must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Lucy Dunne, Helena Dupont Wright or counsel for Lucy Dunne, Helena Dupont Wright are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/23/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2021 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT FORM & EVENT) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ishak, April) Modified on 9/9/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by April C Ishak on behalf of Lucy Dunne (Ishak, April)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT FORM & EVENT) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ishak, April) Modified on 9/9/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Helena Dupont Wright (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ishak, April) Modified on 9/9/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by T. Kimberly Williams (Kotz, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Notice (Other) filed by T. Kimberly Williams was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings > Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. **Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE by T. Kimberly Williams Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Kotz, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/23/2021 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Scott Scott, LLP on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scott, Kirsten)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lucy Dunne, Helena Dupont Wright. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/17/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. T. Kimberly Williams or counsel for T. Kimberly Williams are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/31/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by T. Kimberly Williams re #1 Complaint (Kotz, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by T. Kimberly Williams re #1 Complaint (Kotz, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by T. Kimberly Williams re #1 Complaint (Kotz, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9438493.), filed by T. Kimberly Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kotz, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Kimberly Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey M Kotz
Represented By: Elizabeth Hopkins
Represented By: Susan Lynn Meter
Represented By: Kirsten Scott Scott, LLP
Represented By: Teresa S Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Dupont Wright
Represented By: April C Ishak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Dunne
Represented By: April C Ishak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?