International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. H.A. Chiovarou, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund and Tim D. Maitland
Defendant: H.A. Chiovarou, Inc., Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC and Daniel J. Chiovarou
Case Number: 1:2021cv02119
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC, H.A. Chiovarou, Inc., Daniel J. Chiovarou. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/1/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P Jackson on behalf of Daniel J. Chiovarou, Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC, H.A. Chiovarou, Inc. (Jackson, Vincent)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Daniel J. Chiovarou, Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC, H.A. Chiovarou, Inc.(Jackson, Vincent)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Bernard Geiger on behalf of All Defendants (Geiger, Clifford)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(DelTergo, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. Daniel J. Chiovarou served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(DelTergo, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. H.A. Chiovarou, Inc. served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(DelTergo, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Daniel J. Chiovarou, Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC, H.A. Chiovarou, Inc.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland (DelTergo, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel J. Chiovarou, Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC, H.A. Chiovarou, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9445969.), filed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(DelTergo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. H.A. Chiovarou, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael James DelTergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim D. Maitland
Represented By: Michael James DelTergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.A. Chiovarou, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford Bernard Geiger
Represented By: Vincent P Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Chiovarou, LLC
Represented By: Clifford Bernard Geiger
Represented By: Vincent P Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Chiovarou
Represented By: Clifford Bernard Geiger
Represented By: Vincent P Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?