Mission Escape Rooms, LLC v. Escapetime, LLC
Plaintiff: MISSION ESCAPE ROOMS, LLC
Defendant: ESCAPETIME, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02127
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mission Escape Rooms, LLC (Ibrahim, Bassam)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Ibrahim, Bassam)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Escapetime, LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Deficiency Notice as to Mission Escape Rooms, LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/31/2021 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 8/31/2021 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Escapetime, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9447274.), filed by Mission Escape Rooms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Ibrahim, Bassam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Escape Rooms, LLC v. Escapetime, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSION ESCAPE ROOMS, LLC
Represented By: Bassam Naim Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCAPETIME, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?