International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. Hess Glass Company et al
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund and Tim D. Maitland
Defendant: Hess Glass Company, Hess Glass & Maintenance, LLC and HG Commercial Realty, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02162
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. HG Commercial Realty, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(DelTergo, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. Hess Glass & Maintenance, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(DelTergo, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to HG Commercial Realty, LLC, Hess Glass & Maintenance, LLC, Hess Glass Company.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland (DelTergo, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HG Commercial Realty, LLC, Hess Glass & Maintenance, LLC, Hess Glass Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9451337.), filed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(DelTergo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. Hess Glass Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael James DelTergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim D. Maitland
Represented By: Michael James DelTergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Glass Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Glass & Maintenance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HG Commercial Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?