NFM, Inc. v. Paris et al
Plaintiff: NFM, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Paris, Edgar Ramirez, Michael Indaburu and Dominick James Christiana
Case Number: 1:2021cv02277
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MARGINAL ORDER approving #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by NFM, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/14/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NFM, Inc. (Gowda, Chaitra)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NFM, Inc.. (Sinclair, William)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #7 Affidavit of Service, Summons Returned Executed filed by NFM, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons returned executed" and input the date of service for each party served. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Michael Indaburu on September 16, 2021, filed by NFM, Inc.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by NFM, Inc.. Michael Indaburu served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021.(Sinclair, William) Modified on 10/12/2021 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NFM, Inc. (Sinclair, William)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dominick James Christiana, Michael Indaburu, Brian Paris, Edgar Ramirez.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/3/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. NFM, Inc. or counsel for NFM, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/17/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Jury Trial Demand by NFM, Inc.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9475109.), filed by NFM, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Paris, #3 Summons Summons - Ramirez, #4 Summons Summons - Indaburu, #5 Summons Summons - Christiana)(Sinclair, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NFM, Inc. v. Paris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFM, Inc.
Represented By: Chaitra Gowda
Represented By: Christopher Macchiaroli
Represented By: Ilona Shparaga
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Indaburu
Represented By: Jennifer S Jackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick James Christiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?