Air Freight Plus, Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: Air Freight Plus, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv02353
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Cancelling Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 11/1/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Abel, Christopher)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE #15 notice of intent to file a motion to consolidate. Parties shall be prepared to discuss their respective views on the possible consolidation of this matter with Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Inc., et al. v. Air Freight Plus, Inc., et al. (20-cv-03728-BPG), during the Scheduling Conference scheduled to be held on November 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/13/2021. (js6, Chambers)
October 11, 2021 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Air Freight Plus, Inc. (Herbst, Jonathan)
October 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Air Freight Plus, Inc. Notice of Intent to File Motion to Consolidate (Herbst, Jonathan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A Abel. Directing attorney Christopher A Abel to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Abel (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9526065.) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Court Admissions, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Roswell, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal /Statement Concerning Removal filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Roswell, Craig)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Chambers (telephonic) before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Requests for Modifications of the Scheduling Order due 10/26/21. Post-Discovery Status Report due by 3/22/2022. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/24/2021. (js6, Chambers)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Roswell, Craig)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/16/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America was filed incorrectly. **For future removal filings, all lower court documents should be individually labeled and attached. The changes have been made on your behalf. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/15/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Removal of Action by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued 30 days as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, filed by Air Freight Plus, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5 (a)(Roswell, Craig)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Phoenix Insurance Company for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Roswell, Craig)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-21-001108. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9494490), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Roswell, Craig)
September 15, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air Freight Plus, Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Freight Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Martin Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Represented By: Christopher A Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?