Westminster American Insurance Company v. Eagles Trace GA LLC
Plaintiff: Westminster American Insurance Company
Defendant: Eagles Trace GA LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02360
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 8705
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Directing attorney to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles M. Adams by Westminster American Insurance Company. The fee has already been paid.(Adams, Charles)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Westminster American Insurance Company needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles M Adams. Directing attorney Charles M Adams to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/30/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles M. Adams (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9523505.) by Westminster American Insurance Company(Burgoyne, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin C. Frommer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9523447.) by Westminster American Insurance Company(Burgoyne, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Westminster American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, (Burgoyne, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint,, filed by Westminster American Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/20/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eagles Trace GA LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9496296.), filed by Westminster American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Burgoyne, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westminster American Insurance Company v. Eagles Trace GA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westminster American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Howard Burgoyne
Represented By: Charles M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagles Trace GA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?