Hirsch v. Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Defendant: Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02362
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Hirsch. Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021.(Sanders, Craig)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Correspondence to the Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (c/m 9/17/21 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9496567.), filed by Steven Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch v. Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?