Miller v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Krista Kay Miller
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2021cv02474
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/24/2021. (vals, Chambers)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Stacey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Cole, Stacey)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/4/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/28/2021. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 11/29/2021 unless otherwise ordered. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Melanson, Theodore)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krista Kay Miller(Melanson, Theodore)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Krista Kay Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melanson, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Kay Miller
Represented By: Theodore Anthony Melanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Represented By: Stacey Irene Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?