Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company v. John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02675
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MARGINAL ORDER approving #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/13/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company (Berkowitz, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company. John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021.(Berkowitz, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit, filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and follow prompts to set answer deadline. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT re #2 Summons Issued summons, complaint and civil cover sheet served on Kevin McGuirk of John J. McGuirk, Inc. & Associates, Inc. by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company(Berkowitz, Matthew) Modified on 11/2/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9554325.), filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Berkowitz, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company v. John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David B. Schlosser
Represented By: Matthew D Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. McGuirk & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?