Tate et al v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Creston G. Tate and The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv02726
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James S. Bainbridge by Creston G. Tate. The fee has already been paid.(Rubino, David)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to American General Life Insurance Company. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate re #1 Complaint, Summons (Rubino, David)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate was filed missing the summons for the defendant. **Please file the proposed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link summons to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate re #1 Complaint, Corrected Exhibit H (Rubino, David)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate re #1 Complaint, Civil Coversheet (Rubino, David)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Coversheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Coversheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Coversheet to #1 . (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2021 Jury Trial Demand by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James S. Bainbridge (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9566729.) by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate(Rubino, David)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against American General Life Ins. Co. against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9566719.), filed by Creston G. Tate, The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Rubino, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate et al v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creston G. Tate
Represented By: David L Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The 1999 Tate Family Irrevocable Trust, by and through its Trustee, Atwood Tate
Represented By: David L Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?