Aristides Marin Marchan v. Pro Lawn Care, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARISTIDES MARIN MARCHAN
Defendant: PRO LAWN CARE LLC, DAVID SCOTT NUTTER and Pro Lawn Care, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02984
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/27/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pro Lawn Care, LLC (Bryant, Matthew)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by David Scott Nutter, Pro Lawn Care, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Bryant on behalf of All Defendants (Bryant, Matthew)
December 23, 2021 Deficiency Notice for Pro Lawn Care, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/30/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aristides Marin Marchan. Pro Lawn Care, LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021.(Balashov, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aristides Marin Marchan. David Scott Nutter served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021.(Balashov, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit filed by Aristides Marin Marchan, #4 Affidavit filed by Aristides Marin Marchan was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 -FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service as to Pro Lawn Care LLC by Aristides Marin Marchan(Balashov, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 -FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service to David Scott Nutter by Aristides Marin Marchan(Balashov, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to David Scott Nutter and Pro Lawn Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9617784.), filed by ARISTIDES MARIN MARCHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to David Nutter, #3 Summons Summons Pro Lawn Care LLC)(Melehy, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aristides Marin Marchan v. Pro Lawn Care, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARISTIDES MARIN MARCHAN
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO LAWN CARE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SCOTT NUTTER
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Lawn Care, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?