State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv03036
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. All Defendants.(Wilk, Adam)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Case Management Order served on Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General on December 7, 2021, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wilk, Adam)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 11/30/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wilk, Adam)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: [1-2] Disclosure of Corporate Interest filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company was filed in error as an attachment to the complaint. **Please refile document under the "Other Documents" category, select the "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" event and add the corporate parent/affiliates when prompted. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Health And Human Services (Food and Drug Administration) ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9627163.), filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 (FILED IN ERROR) Affidavit, #3 Summons)(Wilk, Adam) Modified on 11/29/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
November 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Ross Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?