Len Stoler, Inc. v. Hyundai Motor America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Len Stoler, Inc.
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Corporation, Genesis Motor America LLC, Peter Prather and Michael DePaul
Case Number: 1:2021cv03242
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ryan L Ford. Directing attorney Ryan L Ford to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan L. Ford (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9722695.) by Michael DePaul, Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation, Peter Prather(Marinaccio, Marc)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Genesis Motor America LLC.(Marinaccio, Marc)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Hyundai Motor America Corporation.(Marinaccio, Marc)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Under Local Rule 103.5(a) and Additional Documents on File in State Court Action by Marc A Marinaccio on behalf of Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marinaccio, Marc)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Len Stoler, Inc.. Peter Prather waiver sent on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022.(LaMontagne, Laurel)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Len Stoler, Inc.. Michael DePaul waiver sent on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022.(LaMontagne, Laurel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Len Stoler, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Stoler Automotive New York, Inc., Other Affiliate Stoler Gold Coast, Inc., Other Affiliate Stoler of Queens, Inc., Other Affiliate Stoler of Westbury, Inc. for Len Stoler, Inc..(LaMontagne, Laurel)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation.(Marinaccio, Marc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Michael DePaul, Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation, Peter Prather, filed by Len Stoler, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/22/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Genesis Motor America LLC identifying Other Affiliate Hyundai Motor Company, Other Affiliate Hyundai Motor America Corporation for Genesis Motor America LLC.(Marinaccio, Marc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company, Other Affiliate Genesis Motor America LLC for Hyundai Motor America Corporation.(Marinaccio, Marc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation(Marinaccio, Marc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-21-003840. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9668439), filed by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit C - HMA Summons, #5 Exhibit D - GMA Summons)(Marinaccio, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Len Stoler, Inc. v. Hyundai Motor America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len Stoler, Inc.
Represented By: Laurel LaMontagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Corporation
Represented By: Marc A Marinaccio
Represented By: Ryan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Motor America LLC
Represented By: Marc A Marinaccio
Represented By: Ryan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Prather
Represented By: Marc A Marinaccio
Represented By: Ryan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael DePaul
Represented By: Ryan L Ford
Represented By: Marc A Marinaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?