Wesker et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Mark A. Wesker and Natasha S. Wesker
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03319
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Duhig, Peter)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank of America, N.A. answer due 2/24/2022. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2022. (vals, Chambers)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duhig, Peter)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A..(Duhig, Peter)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Duhig on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Duhig, Peter)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natasha S. Wesker, Mark A. Wesker. All Defendants.(Preston, Anne)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Natasha S. Wesker, Mark A. Wesker was filed incorrectly. ***Please re-file documents by selecting Serviceof Process> Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Bank of America, N.A. on January 4, 2022, filed by Mark A. Wesker, Natasha S. Wesker.(Preston, Anne) Modified on 1/7/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bank of America, N.A..(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mark A. Wesker, Natasha S. Wesker re #1 Complaint Summons (Preston, Anne)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Natasha S. Wesker, Mark A. Wesker was filed incorrectly. **The following attachment is missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,(Filing fee $402 receipt number 0416-9677823) filed by Natasha S. Wesker, Mark A. Wesker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Preston, Anne) Modified on 12/30/2021 (ko, Deputy Clerk).
December 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesker et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Wesker
Represented By: Thomas C Costello
Represented By: Anne L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha S. Wesker
Represented By: Thomas C Costello
Represented By: Anne L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Peter J Duhig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?