Havtech, LLC et al v. AAON, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Havtech, LLC and Havtech Parts Division, LLC
Defendant: AAON, Inc. and AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00453
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F Cavanaugh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cavanaugh, Anthony)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Brand Baum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baum, Deborah)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2022. (vals, Chambers)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply (ECF No. 18) by AAON Coil Products, Inc., AAON, Inc.(Oklahoma) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Ellen)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Havtech Parts Division, LLC, Havtech, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/29/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #20 Notice to Withdraw Plaintiffs Motion to Strike filed by Havtech Parts Division, LLC, Havtech, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/29/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Havtech Parts Division, LLC, Havtech, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dachille, Mark)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Havtech Parts Division, LLC, Havtech, LLC re #19 MOTION to Strike #18 Reply to Response to Motion (Dachille, Mark)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 -WITHDRAWN PER 22 - MOTION to Strike #18 Reply to Response to Motion by Havtech Parts Division, LLC, Havtech, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dachille, Mark) Modified on 3/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by AAON Coil Products, Inc., AAON, Inc.(Oklahoma).(Stewart, Ellen)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Havtech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph Roetering, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Normand Long, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Eckenrode, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dachille, Mark)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #15 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Aaon, Inc. (Neveda) only filed by Havtech, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/8/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal AS TO DEFENDANT AAON, INC. (NEVADA) ONLY by Havtech, LLC(Dachille, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Havtech Parts Division, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Havtech Investments, LLC for Havtech Parts Division, LLC.(Dachille, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Havtech, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Havtech Investments LLC for Havtech, LLC.(Dachille, Mark)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by AAON Coil Products, Inc., AAON, Inc. Statement Concerning Removal (Stewart, Ellen)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 103.5(a) Certificate(Stewart, Ellen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AAON Coil Products, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AAON, Inc., Other Affiliate AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC. for AAON Coil Products, Inc..(Marshall, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AAON, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AAON, Inc., Other Affiliate AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC. for AAON, Inc..(Marshall, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AAON, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AAON, Inc. for AAON, Inc..(Marshall, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of filing of state court material (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Havtech, LLC, Havtech Parts Division, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to AAON, Inc., AAON Coil Products, Inc., AAON, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against AAON, Inc., AAON Coil Products, Inc., AAON, Inc., filed by Havtech, LLC, Havtech Parts Division, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC., AAON, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Havtech Website (2008), #3 Exhibit 2 - AOON (Nevada) Executed Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit AAON, Inc. (Oklahoma), #5 Exhibit 3B - AAON Web Portal, #6 Exhibit 3C - ECAT, #7 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of AAON Coil, #8 Exhibit 5 - AAON Rep Policy Manual, #9 Exhibit 6 - Terms and Conditions, #10 Exhibit 7 - Email with Roetering, #11 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of Gary Fields, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Stephen)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-22-000062. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9777571), filed by AAON, Inc., AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Filing, #3 Exhibit A - Writ and Affidavit of Service of AAON, Inc. (Oklahoma), #4 Exhibit B - Writ and Affidavit of Service of AAON Coil Products, #5 Exhibit C - Writ and Affidavit of Service of AAON, Inc. (Nevada), #6 Exhibit D - Complaint)(Marshall, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havtech, LLC et al v. AAON, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havtech, LLC
Represented By: Mark S Dachille
Represented By: Nicole Lefcourt Campbell
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Represented By: Anthony F Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havtech Parts Division, LLC
Represented By: Mark S Dachille
Represented By: Nicole Lefcourt Campbell
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Represented By: Anthony F Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAON, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Renee Stewart
Represented By: Francis Joseph Falatko, III
Represented By: Stephen J Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAON COIL PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Ellen Renee Stewart
Represented By: Francis Joseph Falatko, III
Represented By: Stephen J Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?