Jiggetts v. Baltimore County Department of Social Services et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Jiggetts
Defendant: Baltimore County Department of Social Services and Gregory Branch
Case Number: 1:2022cv01225
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing complaint; closing case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/6/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/6/22)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/6/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/6/22)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to waive fees by Alexander Jiggetts. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Department of Social Services, Gregory Branch, filed by Alexander Jiggetts. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2022: #3 envelope) (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiggetts v. Baltimore County Department of Social Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Jiggetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?