BTL Industries, Inc v. Tekyard LLC
Plaintiff: BTL Industries, Inc
Defendant: Tekyard LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01762
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Bardenstein, Rami)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Tekyard LLC.(dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 7/21/2022. (mg4s, Chambers)
July 21, 2022 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 7/28/2022 (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BTL Industries, Inc (Bardenstein, Rami)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tekyard LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10056743.), filed by BTL Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex 1: Press Release, #4 Exhibit Ex 2: EMSCULPT Webpage, #5 Exhibit Ex 3: Holden Timeless Article, #6 Exhibit Ex 4: DC Derm Docs Article, #7 Exhibit Ex 5: The Bend Article, #8 Exhibit Ex 6: Health Life Magazine Article, #9 Exhibit Ex 7: US 10695576, #10 Exhibit Ex 8: US 10478634, #11 Exhibit Ex 9: D874009, #12 Exhibit Ex 10: RealSelf 2019 Rankings, #13 Exhibit Ex 11: RealSelf 2020 Rankings, #14 Exhibit Ex 12: Harper's Bazaar Article, #15 Exhibit Ex 13: Emsculpt Award, #16 Exhibit Ex 14: NewBeauty Award, #17 Exhibit Ex 15: BTL Trademarks, #18 Exhibit Ex 16: Tekyard Product, #19 Exhibit Ex 17: Tekyard Product, #20 Exhibit Ex 18: Tekyard Product, #21 Exhibit Ex 19: Tekyard Product)(Bardenstein, Rami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BTL Industries, Inc v. Tekyard LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BTL Industries, Inc
Represented By: Rami Bardenstein, Barde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tekyard LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?