Robertson v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: Keith Robertson
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Case Number: 1:2022cv02007
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 US as Defendant
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Robertson. Commissioner of Internal Revenue served on 9/27/2022, answer due 11/28/2022.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/26/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 9/26/22)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2022 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Summons by Keith Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Order for Issuance)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit a completed summons to the Clerk and the Clerk shall issue a summons and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/20/2022. (c/m and forms 9/20/2022)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 1138), filed by Keith Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachments, #3 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?