Drye v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Sandy Griffin Drye
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2022cv02021
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandy Griffin Drye. All Defendants.(Mendrinos, Nikoletta)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Eugene Richardson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richardson, Ronald)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 8/25/2022. (mg4s, Chambers)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10099315.), filed by Sandy Griffin Drye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Mendrinos, Nikoletta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drye v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Griffin Drye
Represented By: Nikoletta Sara Mendrinos
Represented By: Ronald Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?