Mancho v. Select Portfolio Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Joan Mancho
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02025
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Negotiable Instrumen
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE re #11 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Select Portfolio Services Inc..(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/16/22)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Removal Notification Letter mailed to pro se plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/12/22)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of filing of state court discovery material. (Attachments: #1 Good Faith Discovery Notice)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued 60 days as to Select Portfolio Services Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Services Inc., filed by Joan Mancho.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Select Portfolio Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint by Select Portfolio Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Select Portfolio Services Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Services Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SPS Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Credit Suisse (USA) Inc. for Select Portfolio Services Inc..(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Select Portfolio Services Inc. Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice Filed in Circuit Court for Howard County)(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Howard County, case number C-13-cv-22-000559. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10099468), filed by Select Portfolio Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Request for Doc, #4 Exhibit 4 - Good Faith)(Biscoe-Hall, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancho v. Select Portfolio Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mancho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services Inc.
Represented By: Mary C Biscoe-Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?