G. W. Aru, LLC et al v. W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Plaintiff: G. W. Aru, LLC and Cochise Technology, LLC
Defendant: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02636
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. identifying Corporate Parent Standard Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent W.R. Grace Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent W.R. Grace & Co. for W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn..(Davis, Ahmed)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy Wayne Riffe. Directing attorney Timothy Wayne Riffe to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy W. Riffe (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10261927.) by W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.(Davis, Ahmed)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.'s answer due on or before 12/22/2022. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/7/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed Jamal Davis on behalf of W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (Davis, Ahmed)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G. W. Aru, LLC, Cochise Technology, LLC. W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022.(Squillario, Jennifer)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shawn G. Hansen. Directing attorney Shawn G. Hansen to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shawn G. Hansen (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10207930.) by Cochise Technology, LLC, G. W. Aru, LLC(Squillario, Jennifer)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Squillario, Jennifer)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cochise Technology, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Guido William Aru, Other Affiliate Darlene Annette Aru for Cochise Technology, LLC.(Squillario, Jennifer)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by G. W. Aru, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Guido William Aru, Other Affiliate Darlene Annette Aru, Other Affiliate B&J Technical Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Business Fields Unlimited, LLC, Other Affiliate Dawn Elaine Sagaser, Other Affiliate Natalie Paige Herring for G. W. Aru, LLC.(Squillario, Jennifer)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10207696.), filed by G. W. Aru, LLC, Cochise Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons)(Squillario, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. W. Aru, LLC et al v. W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. W. Aru, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Shawn G. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cochise Technology, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Shawn G. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Represented By: Timothy Wayne Riffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?