The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust v. Rehab.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust
Defendant: Rehab.com, LLC, CCR Holdings, LLC and Patrick Nagle
Case Number: 1:2022cv03003
Filed: November 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 1/17/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2023 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by CCR Holdings, LLC, Patrick Nagle, Rehab.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abelson, Adam)
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 14 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. CCR Holdings, LLC, Rehab.com, LLC must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/12/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Corporate Disclosure Statements by CCR Holdings, LLC, Patrick Nagle, Rehab.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichtstein, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. CCR Holdings, LLC, Rehab.com, LLC or counsel for CCR Holdings, LLC, Rehab.com, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/27/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Abelson on behalf of CCR Holdings, LLC, Rehab.com, LLC (Abelson, Adam)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Patrick Nagle or counsel for Patrick Nagle are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/21/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Marc Lichtstein on behalf of Patrick Nagle (Lichtstein, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Patrick Martin on behalf of Patrick Nagle (Martin, Gerard)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/27/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/6/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/21/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust or counsel for The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/5/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CCR Holdings, LLC, Patrick Nagle, Rehab.com, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10279233.), filed by The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Nagle, #7 Summons CCR Holdings, #8 Summons Rehab.com)(Blumenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust v. Rehab.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ryan N. Rice 2018 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Michael Evan Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab.com, LLC
Represented By: Adam Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCR Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Adam Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Nagle
Represented By: Gerard Patrick Martin
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Lichtstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?